AL HB534 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Athletic Commission, regulatory act renamed, authority over unarmed combat provided, certain medical and competition guidelines exempted from Administrative Procedure Act, fines for violations of rules and guidelines limited in amount, procedural process for handling violations revised, Secs. 41-9-1020, 41-9-1021, 41-9-1023, 41-9-1024, 41-9-1037, 41-9-1038 am'd.
Title
Athletic Commission, regulatory act renamed, authority over unarmed combat provided, certain medical and competition guidelines exempted from Administrative Procedure Act, fines for violations of rules and guidelines limited in amount, procedural process for handling violations revised, Secs. 41-9-1020, 41-9-1021, 41-9-1023, 41-9-1024, 41-9-1037, 41-9-1038 am'd.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-04-01 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions first Amendment Offered |
2021-04-01 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
Same As/Similar To
SB333 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-518.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 9 | 1020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 1023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 1024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 1037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 1038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |