AL SB333 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-518.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-518.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Athletic Commission, regulatory act renamed, authority over unarmed combat provided, certain medical and competition guidelines exempted from Administrative Procedure Act, fines for violations of rules and guidelines limited in amount, procedural process for handling violations revised, Secs. 41-9-1020, 41-9-1021, 41-9-1023, 41-9-1024, 41-9-1037, 41-9-1038 am'd.
Title
Athletic Commission, regulatory act renamed, authority over unarmed combat provided, certain medical and competition guidelines exempted from Administrative Procedure Act, fines for violations of rules and guidelines limited in amount, procedural process for handling violations revised, Secs. 41-9-1020, 41-9-1021, 41-9-1023, 41-9-1024, 41-9-1037, 41-9-1038 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1459 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1215 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1214 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 876 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 875 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - SBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 874 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1215 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 1214 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 876 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 875 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - SBIR: Allen motion to Adopt Roll Call 874 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-17 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2021-518. |
2021-05-17 | House | Signature Requested |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Enrolled |
2021-05-17 | House | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1459 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Concurrence Requested |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1215 |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1214 |
2021-05-17 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2021-05-17 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-04-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 876 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Allen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 875 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Tourism Amendment Offered |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism |
Same As/Similar To
HB534 (Same As) 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 9 | 1020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 1023 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 1024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 1037 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 9 | 1038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |