AL HB517 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public School and College Authority, bonds, issuance of $30,000,000 million for schools damaged in tornados for improvements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public School and College Authority, bonds, issuance of $30,000,000 million for schools damaged in tornados for improvements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 48) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - House - Motion to Previous Question (Y: 72 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-20HouseDelivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
2013-05-20HouseAssigned Act No. 2013-345.
2013-05-20HouseClerk of the House Certification
2013-05-20SenateSignature Requested
2013-05-20HouseEnrolled
2013-05-20HousePassed Second House
2013-05-20SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1072
2013-05-20SenateThird Reading Passed
2013-05-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2013-05-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2013-04-30HouseEngrossed
2013-04-30HouseCosponsors Added
2013-04-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1030
2013-04-30HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1029
2013-04-30HouseMoore (M) motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 1028
2013-04-30HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2013-04-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2013-04-24HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2013-04-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB517
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB517-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB517-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2013RS/PrintFiles/HB517-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=471403&VOTE=1028&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=471404&VOTE=1029&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=471408&VOTE=1030&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=471409&VOTE=1031&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=475883&VOTE=1072&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1061&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback