AL HB517 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Hospitals and emergency medical services, statewide trauma system and council, council amended, coordination of pre-hospital and hospital care, regulated by Health Department and other systems and other health services for other illnesses, Secs. 22-11D-1 to 22-11D-9, inclusive, am'd; Sec. 22-11D-10 added
Title
Hospitals and emergency medical services, statewide trauma system and council, council amended, coordination of pre-hospital and hospital care, regulated by Health Department and other systems and other health services for other illnesses, Secs. 22-11D-1 to 22-11D-9, inclusive, am'd; Sec. 22-11D-10 added
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-526. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1516 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health | |
2012-04-17 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-17 | Boman intended top vote "Yea" | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 811 | |
2012-04-17 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 810 | |
2012-04-17 | Health first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-17 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2012-03-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |