AL HB483 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Delivered to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Delivered to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limestone Co., Tennessee Valley Authority, additional payments in-lieu-of-taxes, distrib. further provided for, Act 79-501, 1979 Reg. Sess. am'd. (2010-20886)
Title
Limestone Co., Tennessee Valley Authority, additional payments in-lieu-of-taxes, distrib. further provided for, Act 79-501, 1979 Reg. Sess. am'd. (2010-20886)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 39) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 52) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 39) [FAIL]
2012-04-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 34 Abs: 52) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | Delivered to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m. | |
2012-04-19 | Assigned Act No. 2012-240 on 04/24/2012. | |
2012-04-19 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-04-19 | Enrolled | |
2012-04-19 | Signature Requested | |
2012-04-19 | Passed Second House | |
2012-04-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 684 | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted | |
2012-04-19 | Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair | |
2012-04-12 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-10 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2012-04-10 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 620 | |
2012-04-10 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 619 | |
2012-04-10 | Williams (D) Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-10 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-03-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |