AL HB437 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wine, manufacturers, authorized to ship wine directly to Alabama residents, permitting of wine fulfillment centers, require importers and manufacturers of wine to enter into exclusive franchise agreements with wholesalers, to provide for reporting requirements and penalties, Secs. 28-3A-6.1, 28-3A-6.2, 28-8A-1 to 28-8A-11, inclusive, added; Sec. 28-1-4, 28-3-1 am'd.
Title
Wine, manufacturers, authorized to ship wine directly to Alabama residents, permitting of wine fulfillment centers, require importers and manufacturers of wine to enter into exclusive franchise agreements with wholesalers, to provide for reporting requirements and penalties, Secs. 28-3A-6.1, 28-3A-6.2, 28-8A-1 to 28-8A-11, inclusive, added; Sec. 28-1-4, 28-3-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1107 (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1245 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1244 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1243 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1242 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 614 (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 613 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 612 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 71) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1245 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1244 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1243 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 1242 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 614 (Y: 83 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 613 (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - HBIR: Collins motion to Adopt Roll Call 612 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 71) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-419. |
2021-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Collins motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1107 |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1245 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1244 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Smitherman Amendment Offered |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1243 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Tourism first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism |
2021-04-01 | House | Engrossed |
2021-04-01 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2021-04-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 614 |
2021-04-01 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 613 |
2021-04-01 | House | Economic Development and Tourism first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-04 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-02-23 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |
Same As/Similar To
SB146 (Same As) 2021-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Tourism
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 3 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 3A | 6.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 3A | 6.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
28 | 8A | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |