AL HB416 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on March 30, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on March 30, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Class 5 mun., organized under Act 71, 1977 Reg. Sess., (Phenix City), city council salary and expense allowance, mayor salary, Act 2009-737, 2009 Reg. Sess., repealed and superseded
Title
Class 5 mun., organized under Act 71, 1977 Reg. Sess., (Phenix City), city council salary and expense allowance, mayor salary, Act 2009-737, 2009 Reg. Sess., repealed and superseded
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 793 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 792 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 445 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: Blackshear motion to Adopt Roll Call 444 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SBIR: Chambliss motion to Adopt Roll Call 792 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 445 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2022-03-03 - House - HBIR: Blackshear motion to Adopt Roll Call 444 (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 54 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:17 p.m. on March 30, 2022. |
2022-03-30 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-259. |
2022-03-30 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-03-30 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 793 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 445 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |