AL HB360 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Forwarded to Governor on March 11, 2014 at 2:18 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Forwarded to Governor on March 11, 2014 at 2:18 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Employment regulation, counties, municipalities, or other political subdivision may not require employers to grant vacation or other leave to employees
Title
Employment regulation, counties, municipalities, or other political subdivision may not require employers to grant vacation or other leave to employees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 11, 2014 at 2:18 p.m. |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-173. |
2014-03-11 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 752 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Business and Labor |
2014-02-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 344 |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-30 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business |