AL HB355 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 4:21 p.m. on May 7, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Delivered to Governor at 4:21 p.m. on May 7, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Madison Co., Huntsville Public Library Bd., add'l members appt. by City of Madison and Madison Co. Comm., bd renamed Huntsville-Mad. Co. Public Library Bd.
Title
Madison Co., Huntsville Public Library Bd., add'l members appt. by City of Madison and Madison Co. Comm., bd renamed Huntsville-Mad. Co. Public Library Bd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2020-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:21 p.m. on May 7, 2020. |
2020-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2020-133. |
2020-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2020-05-06 | House | Enrolled |
2020-05-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 602 |
2020-05-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2020-05-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Madison County Legislation |
2020-03-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 235 |
2020-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-27 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Madison County Legislation |