AL HB355 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Delivered to Governor at 10:24 a.m. on May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Delivered to Governor at 10:24 a.m. on May 21, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture and Industries Department, laboratory testing, authorized to be performed by federal government or other state governments, Secs. 2-2-33, 2-2-35 am'd.
Title
Agriculture and Industries Department, laboratory testing, authorized to be performed by federal government or other state governments, Secs. 2-2-33, 2-2-35 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:24 a.m. on May 21, 2015. |
2015-05-21 | House | Engrossed |
2015-05-21 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-262. |
2015-05-21 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1047 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Agriculture, Conservation, and Forestry |
2015-04-23 | House | Engrossed |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 511 |
2015-04-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 510 |
2015-04-23 | House | Agriculture and Forestry Amendment Offered |
2015-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2015-03-31 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Agriculture and Forestry |