AL HB346 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Employees' Retirement System, deadline for passing resolution for local employer participating in system to provide Tier I benefits to Tier II employees removed, Sec. 36-27-6.5 am'd.
Title
Employees' Retirement System, deadline for passing resolution for local employer participating in system to provide Tier I benefits to Tier II employees removed, Sec. 36-27-6.5 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1029 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 399 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - HBIR: Ellis motion to Adopt Roll Call 398 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 399 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - HBIR: Ellis motion to Adopt Roll Call 398 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:46 a.m. on April 7, 2022. |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-348. |
2022-04-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1029 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-03-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 399 |
2022-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |