AL HB314 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Distinctive license plate to include fire chaplains
Title
Distinctive license plate to include fire chaplains
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 355 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Pending Senate Veterans and Military Affairs |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
2024-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 355 |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-07 | House | Pending House Public Safety and Homeland Security |
2024-03-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |