AL HB301 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-20 - Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public Service Commission, regulation of pipelines for gas and hazardous liquids, penalties for violation of safety standards increased, Secs. 37-4-87, 37-4-96 am'd.
Title
Public Service Commission, regulation of pipelines for gas and hazardous liquids, penalties for violation of safety standards increased, Secs. 37-4-87, 37-4-96 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Greer [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-20 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 17 Favorable from Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities |
2014-02-13 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 292 |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure |