AL HB293 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement benefits, revise circumstances when an individual's pension, annuity, or retirement allowance benefits are subject to certain recovery actions, Secs. 16-25-23, 36-27-28 am'd.
Title
Retirement benefits, revise circumstances when an individual's pension, annuity, or retirement allowance benefits are subject to certain recovery actions, Secs. 16-25-23, 36-27-28 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Jamie Kiel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 863 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Kiel motion to Adopt Roll Call 862 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - HBIR: Kiel motion to Adopt Roll Call 862 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2022-03-31 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 863 |
2022-03-31 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 25 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 27 | 28 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |