AL HB222 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Drake motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - Drake motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational therapy, Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact, occupational therapists authorized to practice on a limited basis among compact states
Title
Occupational therapy, Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact, occupational therapists authorized to practice on a limited basis among compact states
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | Drake motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
Same As/Similar To
SB167 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - Assigned Act No. 2022-93.