AL SB167 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Assigned Act No. 2022-93.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Assigned Act No. 2022-93.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Occupational therapy, Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact, occupational therapists authorized to practice on a limited basis among compact states
Title
Occupational therapy, Occupational Therapy Licensure Compact, occupational therapists authorized to practice on a limited basis among compact states
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 312 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Drake motion to Adopt Roll Call 311 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 250 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 249 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - HBIR: Drake motion to Adopt Roll Call 311 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 250 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - SBIR: Shelnutt motion to Adopt Roll Call 249 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-93. |
2022-03-01 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-02-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 312 |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Rereferred from Health to M&VA |
2022-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 250 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB222 (Same As) 2022-02-24 - Drake motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote