AL HB108 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:10 p.m. on May 7, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:10 p.m. on May 7, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Foley, corp. limits alt.
Title
Foley, corp. limits alt.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 37 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 4:10 p.m. on May 7, 2015. |
2015-05-07 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-174. |
2015-05-07 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-05-07 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 847 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 197 |
2015-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-31 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |