AL HB104 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Delivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Etowah Co., personnel bd. for co. employees, per diem for meetings and hearings, Sec. 45-28-121 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Etowah Co., personnel bd. for co. employees, per diem for meetings and hearings, Sec. 45-28-121 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 63 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27HouseDelivered to Governor at 2:28 p.m. on March 27, 2018.
2018-03-27HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-579.
2018-03-27HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-27SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-22HouseEnrolled
2018-03-22HousePassed Second House
2018-03-22SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1126
2018-03-22SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-03-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
2018-02-27HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 479
2018-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-02-22HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback