AL HB10 | 2010 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 51-2)
Status: Passed on December 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-14 - Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on December 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriations, pass-through appropriations, defined and prohibited, exception for valid support of agency programs, administrative and criminal penalties for violations by agencies, line-item appropriations authorized, reporting requirements, Budget Accountability Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations, pass-through appropriations, defined and prohibited, exception for valid support of agency programs, administrative and criminal penalties for violations by agencies, line-item appropriations authorized, reporting requirements, Budget Accountability Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-03-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-03-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-12-14 Delivered to Governor at 3:10 p.m. on December 14, 2010.
2010-12-14 Assigned Act No. 2010-759 on 12/14/2010.
2010-12-14 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-12-14 Signature Requested
2010-12-14 Enrolled
2010-12-14 Passed Second House
2010-12-14 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 40
2010-12-14 Died in Committee on 12/16/2010
2010-12-13 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-12-10 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
2010-12-10 Cosponsors Added
2010-12-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1
2010-12-10 Died in Committee on 12/16/2010
2010-12-09 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-12-08 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ethics

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback