AK SJR23 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 9/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting Naming Mtn After Gail Phillips
Title
Supporting Naming Mtn After Gail Phillips
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 9/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 17 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | 10:20 A.M. 8/30/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-10-05 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): NELSON, JOHNSON |
2022-05-16 | House | VERSION: SJR 23 |
2022-05-16 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-16 | House | PASSED Y39 N1 |
2022-05-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 23 |
2022-05-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022 |
2022-05-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(S.RES) |
2022-05-09 | House | NR: HOPKINS, HANNAN, PATKOTAK |
2022-05-09 | House | DP: MCKAY, FIELDS, CRONK, RAUSCHER, GILLHAM, SCHRAGE |
2022-05-09 | House | RES RPT 6DP 3NR |
2022-04-25 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, FOSTER |
2022-04-25 | House | RES |
2022-04-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-20 | Senate | VERSION: SJR 23 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | COSTELLO, REVAK, GRAY-JACKSON, MICCICHE |
2022-04-20 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES, KAWASAKI, HOLLAND, STEVENS, VON IMHOF, BISHOP, BEGICH |
2022-04-20 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SJR 23 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/20 CAL |
2022-04-19 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-19 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2022 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(S.RES) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, KIEHL, KAWASAKI, STEVENS |
2022-03-21 | Senate | RES RPT 4DP |
2022-02-22 | Senate | RES |
2022-02-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |