AK SJR16 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expressing support for responsible development of the oil and gas resources in federal waters offshore of Alaska's coast as a means to ensure energy independence, security for the nation, and jobs for Alaskans; and urging the United States Congress to provide a means for consistently sharing with all coastal energy-producing states, on an ongoing basis, revenue generated from oil and gas development on the outer continental shelf, to ensure that those states develop, support, and maintain necessary infrastructure and preserve environmental integrity.
Title
Offshore Oil & Gas Revenue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/23 LEGIS RESOLVE 16 | |
2009-08-05 | 1:10 PM 5/21/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-04-19 | VERSION: CSSJR 16(RES) | |
2009-04-19 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2009-04-19 | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP | |
2009-04-18 | RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 4/19 | |
2009-04-17 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, JOHNSON, KAWASAKI, CRAWFORD | |
2009-04-17 | JOHANSEN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2009-04-17 | PASSED Y40 | |
2009-04-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 16(RES) | |
2009-04-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG | |
2009-04-14 | FN1: ZERO(S.RES) | |
2009-04-14 | NR: OLSON, EDGMON, KAWASAKI | |
2009-04-14 | DP: GUTTENBERG, TUCK, SEATON, NEUMAN | |
2009-04-14 | RES RPT 4DP 3NR | |
2009-04-06 | RES | |
2009-04-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-03 | VERSION: CSSJR 16(RES) | |
2009-04-03 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-04-03 | PASSED Y16 N- E2 A1 V1 | |
2009-04-03 | STEVENS | |
2009-04-03 | COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, WAGONER, THOMAS, OLSON, DAVIS, ELLIS, PASKVAN, MENARD, | |
2009-04-03 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 16(RES) | |
2009-04-03 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-03 | RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-03 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-02 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2009 | |
2009-03-30 | FN1: ZERO(S.RES) | |
2009-03-30 | NR: HUGGINS | |
2009-03-30 | DP: MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI, FRENCH, STEVENS | |
2009-03-30 | RES RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE | |
2009-03-20 | RES | |
2009-03-20 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |