AK SCR30 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 11 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-27 - LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 45
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 312, relating to arrest without a warrant for assault in the fourth degree at a health care facility; and relating to an aggravating factor at sentencing for a felony offense against a medical professional at a health care facility.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 312
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-11 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | LEGISLATIVE RESOLVE 45 |
2018-06-27 | Senate | 2:34 PM 6/12/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-11 | House | VERSION: SCR 30 |
2018-05-11 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-11 | House | PASSED Y38 N1 A1 |
2018-05-11 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2018-05-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2018-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 30 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2018-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2018-05-10 | Senate | TAKEN UP UC |
2018-05-09 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |