AK SCR20 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-27 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 46
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 20, relating to commercial fishing loans for energy efficiency upgrades and increasing the maximum amount for certain loans under the Commercial Fishing Loan Act.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 20
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-27 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/2 LEGIS RESOLVE 46 | |
2010-07-09 | 11:40 AM 6/11/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-04-16 | VERSION: SCR 20 | |
2010-04-16 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y27 E1 A12 | |
2010-04-16 | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS | |
2010-04-16 | READ THE FIRST TIME | |
2010-04-16 | VERSION: SCR 20 | |
2010-04-16 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2010-04-16 | PASSED Y19 N- E1 | |
2010-04-16 | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2010-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |