AK SCR19 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Joint Resolution No. 19, urging the Secretary of the United States Air Force, the Chief of Staff of the United States Air Force, and the Commander of the Pacific Air Forces to base F-35 aircraft assigned to the Pacific Air Forces at Eielson Air Force Base.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hjr 19
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-03-03 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 3/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 32 |
2014-03-12 | Senate | 8:39 AM 3/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-03-03 | House | VERSION: SCR 19 |
2014-03-03 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-03-03 | House | PASSED Y35 E5 |
2014-03-03 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2014-03-03 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2014-02-28 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 19 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-02-28 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E3 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-02-28 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |