AK SCR14 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to health and social service best practice models and identifying citizen networks to achieve solutions to health and social problems in the state.
Title
H&ss Regional Best Practice Models
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-02 | Senate | DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14 |
2014-07-02 | Senate | 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FEIGE, TUCK, HUGHES, JOSEPHSON |
2014-04-16 | House | VERSION: CSSCR 14(HSS) |
2014-04-16 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-16 | House | PASSED Y38 E1 A1 |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, KELLER |
2014-04-02 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-04-02 | House | DP: SEATON, PRUITT, TARR, NAGEAK, KELLER, HIGGINS |
2014-04-02 | House | HSS RPT 6DP |
2014-03-19 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2014-03-18 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MUNOZ |
2014-03-18 | House | HSS |
2014-03-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-17 | Senate | VERSION: CSSCR 14(HSS) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-03-17 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2014-03-17 | Senate | HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2014 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE |
2014-03-03 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2014-03-03 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, KELLY |
2014-03-03 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE |
2014-02-07 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL |
2014-02-07 | Senate | HSS |
2014-02-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |