AK SB97 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to pension obligation bonds.
Title
Pension Obligation Bonds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendments to SB 97 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2018-04-30 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2018-04-30 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2018-04-28 | House | VERSION: HCS SB 97(FIN) AM H |
2018-04-28 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2018-04-28 | House | PASSED Y36 E4 |
2018-04-28 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2018-04-28 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-28 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2018-04-28 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 97(FIN) |
2018-04-27 | House | ADJOURNED TO 4/28 CALENDAR |
2018-04-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR |
2018-04-26 | House | FIN HCS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | FN2: ZERO(REV) |
2018-04-11 | House | NR: WILSON, TILTON |
2018-04-11 | House | DP: GARA, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-11 | House | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 8DP 2NR |
2017-04-08 | House | FIN |
2017-04-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-07 | Senate | VERSION: SB 97 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2017-04-06 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-06 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 97 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/6 CALENDAR |
2017-04-05 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-05 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(REV) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | NR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2017-04-04 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | FIN RPT 5DP 2NR |
2017-03-31 | Senate | BILL REPRINTED 3/31/17 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | PRIME SPONSOR CHANGED: SENATE FINANCE COMMITTEE REPLACED MACKINNON |
2017-03-23 | Senate | FIN |
2017-03-23 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Bonds & Bonding
Budget
Finance
Legislative Committees
Legislature
Public Employees
Retirement
Bonds & Bonding
Budget
Finance
Legislative Committees
Legislature
Public Employees
Retirement