AK SB79 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-18 - FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the prescription of opioids; establishing the Voluntary Nonopioid Directive Act; relating to the controlled substance prescription database; relating to the practice of dentistry; relating to the practice of medicine; relating to the practice of podiatry; relating to the practice of osteopathy; relating to the practice of nursing; relating to the practice of optometry; relating to the practice of veterinary medicine; related to the duties of the Board of Pharmacy; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Opioids;prescriptions;database;licenses
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | House | FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2017-05-18 | Senate | FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2017-05-10 | Senate | FN3: (CED) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | AM: BEGICH, GIESSEL, MICCICHE |
2017-05-10 | Senate | NR: VON IMHOF |
2017-05-10 | Senate | DP: WILSON |
2017-05-10 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 1DP 1NR 3AM NEW TITLE |
2017-04-15 | Senate | FN3: (CED) |
2017-04-15 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-04-15 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2017-04-15 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MEYER, STEVENS, GARDNER |
2017-04-15 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2017-03-06 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2017-03-06 | Senate | FN3: (CED) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(COR) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | L&C, HSS, FIN |
2017-03-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Animals
Boards & Commissions
Corrections
Dentists
Drugs
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians
Regulations
Boards & Commissions
Corrections
Dentists
Drugs
Licensing
Medical Care
Nurses
Occupations & Professions
Optometrists
Pharmacists
Physicians
Regulations