AK SB71 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SECTIONAL ANALYSIS (S) JOURNAL SUPP NO. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-23 - SECTIONAL ANALYSIS (S) JOURNAL SUPP NO. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making corrective amendments to the Alaska Statutes as recommended by the revisor of statutes.
Title
2019 Revisor's Bill
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SB 71 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | SECTIONAL ANALYSIS (S) JOURNAL SUPP NO. 6 |
2019-07-27 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/17/19 |
2019-07-27 | Senate | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/19 CHAPTER 13 SLA 19 |
2019-07-18 | Senate | 11:42 A.M. 7/16/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-05-14 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N- |
2019-05-14 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2019-05-14 | House | VERSION: HCS SB 71(JUD) |
2019-05-14 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2019-05-14 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2019-05-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 71(JUD) |
2019-05-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-14 | House | JUD HCS ADOPTED UC |
2019-05-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2019 |
2019-05-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2019-05-13 | House | DP: WOOL, STUTES, SHAW, CLAMAN |
2019-05-13 | House | JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 4DP |
2019-05-06 | House | JUD |
2019-05-06 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-05-03 | Senate | VERSION: SB 71 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SB 71 |
2019-05-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-03 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-03 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/2/2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | NR: SHOWER, REINBOLD |
2019-05-02 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, MICCICHE, KIEHL |
2019-05-02 | Senate | JUD RPT 3DP 2NR |
2019-04-12 | Senate | STA REFERRAL WAIVED |
2019-03-01 | Senate | STA, JUD |
2019-03-01 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |