AK SB56 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to certain crimes involving controlled substances; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Reclassifying Certain Drug Offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 3 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG |
2013-04-13 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO |
2013-04-13 | House | IN FINANCE |
2013-04-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT |
2013-04-10 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-04-10 | House | FN8: INDETERMINATE(LAW) |
2013-04-10 | House | FN7: ZERO(CRT) |
2013-04-10 | House | FN5: ZERO(COR) |
2013-04-10 | House | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-04-10 | House | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-04-10 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-04-10 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-04-10 | House | DP: GRUENBERG, LYNN, LEDOUX, FOSTER, KELLER |
2013-04-10 | House | JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 5DP |
2013-04-05 | House | JUD, FIN |
2013-04-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-04-04 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 56(JUD) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2013-04-04 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N2 A1 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2013-04-04 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N15 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-04 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N17 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-04 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 56(JUD) |
2013-04-03 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS, MCGUIRE, GARDNER, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, EGAN, STEDMAN, MEYER |
2013-04-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/4 CALENDAR |
2013-04-03 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-03 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-03 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2013 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN |
2013-03-27 | Senate | FN8: INDETERMINATE(LAW) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(CRT) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(COR) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-27 | Senate | AM: OLSON |
2013-03-27 | Senate | NR: FAIRCLOUGH, BISHOP, DUNLEAVY |
2013-03-27 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MEYER, HOFFMAN |
2013-03-27 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 3NR 1AM |
2013-03-11 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(CRT) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | FN6: INDETERMINATE(LAW) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(COR) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DPS) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE, DYSON |
2013-03-11 | Senate | JUD CS RPT 3DP SAME TITLE |
2013-02-15 | Senate | JUD, FIN |
2013-02-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |