AK SB240 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: House Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-26 - REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
Pending: House Health & Social Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act allowing minors 16 years of age or older to consent to behavioral health and mental health services; authorizing school personnel to recommend a behavioral health or mental health professional to a child 16 years of age or older; and relating to medical assistance coverage for rehabilitative, mandatory, and optional services furnished or paid for by a school district on behalf of certain children.
Title
School Medical Assist;treatment Of Minors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Adopt Health & Social Services Committee Substitute (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Adopt Health & Social Services Committee Substitute (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | REFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES |
2024-04-26 | House | HSS |
2024-04-26 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-24 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 240(HSS) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2024-04-24 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N5 A1 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 240(HSS) |
2024-04-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/24 CAL |
2024-04-22 | Senate | HSS CS ADOPTED Y13 N7 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-22 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2024 |
2024-04-08 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DOH) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DOH) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | NR: KAUFMAN |
2024-04-08 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, DUNBAR |
2024-04-08 | Senate | AM: WILSON |
2024-04-08 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 2DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE |
2024-02-19 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2024-02-19 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DOH) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DOH) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2024-02-19 | Senate | HSS |
2024-02-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Disabilities
Education
Health & Social Services
Insurance
Medical Care
Mental Health
Minors
Public Assistance
School Districts
Schools
Education
Health & Social Services
Insurance
Medical Care
Mental Health
Minors
Public Assistance
School Districts
Schools