AK SB170 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act modifying the Alaska unemployment insurance statutes by redefining the base period for determining eligibility for unemployment benefits; relating to contributions, interest, penalties, and payments under the Alaska Employment Security Act; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Unemployment Compensation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER | |
2009-08-05 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/25 CHAPTER 27 SLA 09 | |
2009-08-05 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2009-08-05 | 3:10 PM 5/20/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-04-19 | VERSION: CSSB 170(FIN) | |
2009-04-19 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2009-04-18 | SIGNED | |
2009-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-18 | PASSED Y39 A1 | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 170(FIN) | |
2009-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009 | |
2009-04-17 | FN2: ZERO(LWF) | |
2009-04-17 | DP: THOMAS, R.FOSTER, GARA, CRAWFORD, KELLY, FAIRCLOUGH, HAWKER | |
2009-04-17 | FIN RPT 7DP | |
2009-04-14 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA | |
2009-04-14 | FIN | |
2009-04-14 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-13 | VERSION: CSSB 170(FIN) | |
2009-04-13 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-04-13 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-13 | PASSED Y17 N1 E1 V1 | |
2009-04-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 170(FIN) | |
2009-04-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-13 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2009 | |
2009-04-11 | FN1: ZERO(LWF) | |
2009-04-11 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2009-04-11 | FIN RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE | |
2009-04-01 | FN1: ZERO(LWF) | |
2009-04-01 | NR: BUNDE | |
2009-04-01 | DP: PASKVAN, THOMAS, MEYER, DAVIS | |
2009-04-01 | L&C RPT 4DP 1NR | |
2009-03-27 | L&C, FIN | |
2009-03-27 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |