AK SB150 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-12 - COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-12 - COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing an emerging energy technology fund.
Title
Emerging Energy Technology Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | COSPONSOR(S): ELLIS | |
2009-04-06 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-06 | FN1: ZERO(UA) | |
2009-04-06 | NR: WAGONER | |
2009-04-06 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, HUGGINS, STEVENS, FRENCH | |
2009-04-06 | RES RPT CS 4DP 1NR SAME TITLE | |
2009-03-30 | FN1: ZERO(UA) | |
2009-03-30 | DP: MCGUIRE, KOOKESH, WIELECHOWSKI | |
2009-03-30 | ENE RPT 3DP | |
2009-03-13 | ENE, RES, FIN | |
2009-03-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |