AK SB15 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/21/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/21/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to penalties for certain alcohol offenses involving persons under 21 years of age committed by certain sex offenders or child kidnappers.
Title
Sex Offender/underage Alcohol Offense
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/21/11 | |
2011-06-24 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/23 CHAPTER 21 SLA 11 | |
2011-06-24 | 2:25 PM 6/17/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2011-04-16 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA, GUTTENBERG, STOLTZE, JOHNSON, MILLETT | |
2011-04-16 | VERSION: CSSB 15(JUD) | |
2011-04-16 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2011-04-16 | PASSED Y40 | |
2011-04-16 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 15(JUD) | |
2011-04-16 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2011 | |
2011-04-16 | FN4: INDETERMINATE(S.FIN/COR) | |
2011-04-16 | FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2011-04-16 | DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2011-04-16 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, GARA, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, | |
2011-04-16 | FIN RPT 11DP | |
2011-04-15 | FN4: INDETERMINATE(S.FIN/COR) | |
2011-04-15 | FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2011-04-15 | NR: HOLMES | |
2011-04-15 | DP: LYNN, KELLER, THOMPSON, GATTO | |
2011-04-15 | JUD RPT 4DP 1NR | |
2011-04-13 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, PETERSEN | |
2011-04-09 | JUD, FIN | |
2011-04-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-04-08 | VERSION: CSSB 15(JUD) | |
2011-04-08 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2011-04-08 | PASSED Y19 N- A1 | |
2011-04-08 | PASKVAN, EGAN, THOMAS, KOOKESH | |
2011-04-08 | COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, WAGONER, DYSON, GIESSEL, ELLIS, MENARD, | |
2011-04-08 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 15(JUD) | |
2011-04-08 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-08 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-08 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-08 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2011 | |
2011-04-08 | FN4: INDETERMINATE(S.FIN/COR) | |
2011-04-08 | FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2011-04-08 | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON | |
2011-04-08 | DP: HOFFMAN, EGAN, ELLIS | |
2011-04-08 | FIN RPT CS(JUD) 3DP 2NR | |
2011-04-01 | FN3: (COR) | |
2011-04-01 | FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2011-04-01 | DP: FRENCH, COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN | |
2011-04-01 | JUD RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE | |
2011-03-18 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD | |
2011-03-18 | FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW) | |
2011-03-18 | FN1: (COR) | |
2011-03-18 | DP: DAVIS, MEYER, EGAN, DYSON | |
2011-03-18 | HSS RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE | |
2011-01-19 | HSS, JUD | |
2011-01-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-19 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |