AK SB116 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/22/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/22/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making a special appropriation for energy assistance for Alaska residents; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Energy Assistance
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/22/09 | |
2009-08-05 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/21 CHAPTER 16 SLA 09 | |
2009-08-05 | 8:55 AM 5/8/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-04-19 | VERSION: CSSB 116(FIN) | |
2009-04-19 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2009-04-19 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-19 | PASSED Y39 A1 | |
2009-04-19 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 116(FIN) | |
2009-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009 | |
2009-04-18 | NR: AUSTERMAN, HAWKER, STOLTZE | |
2009-04-18 | DNP: KELLY | |
2009-04-18 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, FAIRCLOUGH, CRAWFORD, SALMON, JOULE | |
2009-04-18 | FIN RPT 6DP 1DNP 3NR | |
2009-03-27 | FIN | |
2009-03-27 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-03-25 | VERSION: CSSB 116(FIN) | |
2009-03-25 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2009-03-25 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-03-25 | PASSED Y18 N- E1 V1 | |
2009-03-25 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 116(FIN) | |
2009-03-23 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/25 CALENDAR | |
2009-03-23 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-03-23 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-03-23 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, OLSON, ELLIS | |
2009-03-11 | FIN RPT CS 6DP NEW TITLE | |
2009-02-19 | FIN | |
2009-02-19 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget
Energy
Federal Aid
Municipalities
Oil & Gas
Public Assistance
Special Appropriations
Unorganized Borough
Budget
Energy
Federal Aid
Municipalities
Oil & Gas
Public Assistance
Special Appropriations
Unorganized Borough