AK SB108 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - FN5: (CRT)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-15 - FN5: (CRT)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the confidentiality of certain records of criminal cases; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Confidentiality Of Criminal Case Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to CSSB 108(JUD)? Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - House - House: HCS CSSB 108(FIN) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - House - House: HCS CSSB 108(FIN) Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-20 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 7 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 4 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | FN5: (CRT) |
2014-05-15 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 266 |
2014-05-15 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 5/14/14 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2014-04-21 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-04-21 | Senate | CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N1 |
2014-04-21 | Senate | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-21 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 108(FIN) |
2014-04-21 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-20 | House | VERSION: HCS CSSB 108(FIN) |
2014-04-20 | House | ENGROSSED |
2014-04-20 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): ISAACSON, KELLER |
2014-04-20 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y39 A1 |
2014-04-20 | House | PASSED Y23 N16 A1 |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 108(FIN) |
2014-04-20 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N30 A3 |
2014-04-20 | House | FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-20 | House | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/20/2014 |
2014-04-20 | House | FN7: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-04-20 | House | FN6: ZERO(DHS) |
2014-04-20 | House | FN5: (CRT) |
2014-04-20 | House | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-20 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-20 | House | NR: NEUMAN, EDGMON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN |
2014-04-20 | House | DNP: GUTTENBERG, HOLMES |
2014-04-20 | House | DP: THOMPSON, T.WILSON, MUNOZ, GARA |
2014-04-20 | House | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 2DNP 5NR |
2014-04-20 | House | IN FINANCE |
2014-04-20 | House | RLS TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT |
2014-04-19 | House | IN FINANCE |
2014-04-19 | House | RLS TO CALENDAR PENDING REPORT |
2014-04-16 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): T.WILSON |
2014-04-13 | House | FN6: ZERO(DHS) |
2014-04-13 | House | FN5: (CRT) |
2014-04-13 | House | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-13 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-04-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-04-13 | House | NR: PRUITT, GRUENBERG |
2014-04-13 | House | DP: LEDOUX, LYNN, KELLER |
2014-04-13 | House | JUD RPT 3DP 2NR |
2014-03-31 | House | JUD, FIN |
2014-03-31 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-28 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 108(JUD) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2014-03-28 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N1 E1 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | DUNLEAVY, STEVENS, KELLY, ELLIS, FAIRCLOUGH |
2014-03-28 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, MEYER, |
2014-03-28 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2014-03-28 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N15 E1 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-28 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N17 E1 |
2014-03-28 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-28 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 108(JUD) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/28 CALENDAR |
2014-03-26 | Senate | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-26 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-26 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(DHS) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | FN5: (CRT) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | NR: HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, OLSON |
2014-03-18 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MEYER, DUNLEAVY, BISHOP |
2014-03-18 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 3NR |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(CRT) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-03-07 | Senate | AM: WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON |
2014-03-07 | Senate | NR: COGHILL |
2014-03-07 | Senate | DP: DYSON |
2014-03-07 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 1DP 1NR 2AM SAME TITLE |
2014-01-22 | Senate | JUD, FIN |
2014-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-22 | Senate | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14 |