AK HJR38 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE, STEVENS, BEGICH
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-24 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE, STEVENS, BEGICH
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to certain conveyances to the Alaska Railroad Corporation under the Alaska Railroad Transfer Act of 1982.
Title
Ak Railroad Transfer Act; Conveyances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE, STEVENS, BEGICH |
2018-04-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2018-04-24 | Senate | TRA |
2018-04-24 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-20 | House | VERSION: HJR 38 |
2018-04-20 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, KAWASAKI |
2018-04-20 | House | PASSED Y32 N2 E5 A1 |
2018-04-20 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HJR 38 |
2018-04-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO, SADDLER |
2018-04-18 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/20 CALENDAR |
2018-04-18 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-18 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2018 |
2018-04-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-04-14 | House | NR: LEDOUX |
2018-04-14 | House | DNP: CLAMAN |
2018-04-14 | House | DP: EASTMAN, KOPP, STUTES |
2018-04-14 | House | JUD RPT 3DP 1DNP 1NR |
2018-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ, STUTES, EASTMAN |
2018-03-09 | House | FN1: ZERO(LEG) |
2018-03-09 | House | NR: LEDOUX, WOOL, JOHNSON, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2018-03-09 | House | DP: BIRCH |
2018-03-09 | House | STA RPT 1DP 4NR |
2018-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KNOPP, RAUSCHER |
2018-02-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, BIRCH, WILSON |
2018-02-21 | House | STA, JUD |
2018-02-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |