AK HJR30 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-7-1)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-01 - 2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requesting that the federal government and the United States Secretary of the Interior reconsider the Izembek Land Exchange decision and approve the Izembek Land Exchange, allowing the residents of King Cove to have road access to the Cold Bay Airport for critical health and safety reasons and to improve the quality of their lives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Izembek Land Exchange

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendment No. 1 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-01House2:52 PM 7/1 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-05-20HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2014-04-12SenateVERSION: HJR 30 AM
2014-04-12SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2014-04-12SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2014-04-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 30 AM
2014-04-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2014
2014-04-02SenateFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2014-04-02SenateDP: GIESSEL, FRENCH, MICCICHE, BISHOP, DYSON
2014-04-02SenateRES RPT 5DP
2014-03-26SenateRES WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2014-03-19SenateMEYER, MICCICHE, OLSON, STEVENS, KELLY
2014-03-19SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): HOFFMAN, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, BISHOP, EGAN, GIESSEL, FAIRCLOUGH,
2014-03-19SenateRES
2014-03-19SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-03-18HouseVERSION: HJR 30 AM
2014-03-18HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2014-03-18HousePRUITT, OLSON
2014-03-18HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, JOHNSON, EDGMON, ISAACSON, FEIGE, T.WILSON, HOLMES,
2014-03-18HousePASSED Y34 E4 A2
2014-03-18HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2014-03-18HouseAM NO 2 ADOPTED Y22 N12 E4 A2
2014-03-18HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-18HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2014-03-18HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y28 N7 E4 A1
2014-03-18HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 PASSED Y31 N3 E4 A2
2014-03-18HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HJR 30
2014-03-18HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-03-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2014
2014-03-12HouseFN1: ZERO(LEG)
2014-03-12HouseDP: JOHNSON, KAWASAKI, HAWKER, P.WILSON, OLSON, SEATON, TARR, SADDLER, FEIGE
2014-03-12HouseRES RPT 9DP
2014-02-26HouseRES
2014-02-26HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback