AK HCR3 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Proclaiming April 2017 as Child Abuse Prevention Month; and proclaiming April 7, 2017, as Go Blue Friday.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

April 2017: Child Abuse Prevention Month

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2017-04-19HouseFN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
2017-04-19HouseFOSTER
2017-04-19HouseDP: GARA, WILSON, KAWASAKI, TILTON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN,
2017-04-19HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP
2017-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(H.HSS)
2017-03-24HouseNR: EASTMAN
2017-03-24HouseDP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-24HouseHSS RPT 6DP 1NR
2017-03-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2017-03-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2017-02-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2017-01-23HouseHSS, FIN
2017-01-23HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback