AK HCR3 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Proclaiming April 2017 as Child Abuse Prevention Month; and proclaiming April 7, 2017, as Go Blue Friday.
Title
April 2017: Child Abuse Prevention Month
Sponsors
Rep. Geran Tarr [D] | Rep. Jason Grenn [I] | Rep. Chris Tuck [D] | Rep. Leslie Gara [D] |
Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Daniel Ortiz [I] | Rep. Charisse Millett [R] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-04-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.HSS) |
2017-04-19 | House | FOSTER |
2017-04-19 | House | DP: GARA, WILSON, KAWASAKI, TILTON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, |
2017-04-19 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP |
2017-03-24 | House | FN1: ZERO(H.HSS) |
2017-03-24 | House | NR: EASTMAN |
2017-03-24 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-03-24 | House | HSS RPT 6DP 1NR |
2017-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-03-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2017-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2017-01-23 | House | HSS, FIN |
2017-01-23 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HCR3 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HCR003A.PDF |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HCR003B.PDF |