AK HCR20 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-09 - PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designating February 2012 as American Heart Month.
Title
American Heart Month
Sponsors
Sen. Bettye Davis [D] | Rep. Bob Herron [D] | Rep. Lindsey Holmes [D] | Sen. Scott Kawasaki [D] |
Sen. Lesil McGuire [R] | Rep. Lance Pruitt [R] | Rep. Peggy Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-09 | PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 39 | |
2012-06-06 | 2:50 PM 6/6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-04-11 | VERSION: HCR 20 | |
2012-04-11 | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-11 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, DAVIS | |
2012-04-11 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2012-04-11 | BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2012-04-11 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-04-10 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2012-02-15 | DP: DAVIS, MEYER, DYSON | |
2012-02-15 | HSS RPT 3DP | |
2012-02-06 | HSS | |
2012-02-06 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-02-03 | VERSION: HCR 20 | |
2012-02-03 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-02-03 | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, PRUITT, HOLMES | |
2012-02-03 | PASSED Y37 E2 A1 | |
2012-02-03 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-02-03 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/3/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | COSPONSOR(S): HERRON | |
2012-02-01 | FN1: ZERO(LEG) | |
2012-02-01 | DP: DICK, MILLER, HERRON, KELLER | |
2012-02-01 | HSS RPT 4DP | |
2012-01-25 | HSS | |
2012-01-25 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |