AK HCR12 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Dedicating Bettye J. Davis Committee Room

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dedicating Bettye J. Davis Committee Room

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House: Second Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2020-02-14SenateVERSION: HCR 12
2020-02-14SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2020-02-14SenatePASSED Y17 N- E3
2020-02-14SenateWILSON, COSTELLO, COGHILL, STEVENS, VON IMHOF, STEDMAN, BISHOP, GIESSEL
2020-02-14SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON, WIELECHOWSKI, KIEHL, KAWASAKI, BEGICH, OLSON
2020-02-14SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-02-14SenateTAKEN UP UC
2020-02-14SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 2/14/2020
2020-02-05SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK
2020-02-03HouseVERSION: HCR 12
2020-02-03HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2020-02-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON, STORY
2020-02-03HousePASSED Y37 N1 E1 V1
2020-02-03HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-01-29HouseHELD TO NEXT CALENDAR
2020-01-29HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 1/29/2020
2020-01-21HouseRLS
2020-01-21HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback