AK HB8 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to powers of attorney and other substitute decision-making documents; relating to the uniform probate code; relating to notaries public; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Powers Of Attorney

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-16 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-16 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-07-28HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/17
2016-07-28HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 7/28 CHAPTER 50 SLA 16
2016-07-11House11:39 AM 7/6/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2016-05-11HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2016-04-16HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2016-04-16HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 E2 A2
2016-04-16HouseHELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS
2016-04-15SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 8(JUD)
2016-04-15SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2016-04-15SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2016-04-15SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2016-04-15SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, OLSON, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEDMAN
2016-04-15SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 8(JUD)
2016-04-15SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2016-04-15SenateJUD SCS ADOPTED UC
2016-04-15SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-15SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2016
2016-04-14SenateFN6: ZERO(ADM)
2016-04-14SenateFN5: ZERO(DHS)
2016-04-14SenateFN4: ZERO(LAW)
2016-04-14SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI
2016-04-14SenateDP: MCGUIRE, COGHILL, COSTELLO
2016-04-14SenateJUD RPT SCS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2016-01-29SenateFN4: ZERO(LAW)
2016-01-29SenateFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2016-01-29SenateNR: STEDMAN, STOLTZE
2016-01-29SenateDP: GIESSEL, ELLIS, KELLY
2016-01-29SenateHSS RPT SCS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2015-04-11SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
2015-03-11SenateHSS, JUD
2015-03-11SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2015-03-09HouseVERSION: CSHB 8(JUD) AM
2015-03-09HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2015-03-09HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2015-03-09HousePASSED Y37 N2 E1
2015-03-09HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2015-03-09HouseAM NO 6 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2015-03-09HouseAM NO 5 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2015-03-09HouseAM NO 4 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2015-03-09HouseAM NO 3 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2015-03-09HouseAM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2015-03-09House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2015-03-09HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2015-03-09HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
2015-03-09HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 8(JUD)
2015-03-06HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/9 CALENDAR
2015-03-06HouseJUD CS ADOPTED UC
2015-03-06HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2015-03-06HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/2015
2015-02-25HouseFN2: ZERO(LAW)
2015-02-25HouseFN1: ZERO(DHS)
2015-02-25HouseNR: MILLETT, CLAMAN, GRUENBERG, FOSTER
2015-02-25HouseDP: LYNN, KELLER
2015-02-25HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) 2DP 4NR
2015-01-21HouseJUD
2015-01-21HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2015-01-21HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/15

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=29&bill=HB8
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0008A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0008B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0008C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0008D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0008E.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/29/Bills/HB0008Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB8&jrn=0405&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB8&jrn=2534&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB8&jrn=2418&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=29&bill=HB8&jrn=2417&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback