AK HB79 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to sport fishing operators and sport fishing guides; requiring the Department of Fish and Game to prepare and submit a report; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Saltwater Sportfishing Operators/guides
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date Reconsideration (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-23 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 11 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | FN3: (DFG) |
2022-03-23 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, KAWASAKI, STEVENS, VON IMHOF, KIEHL |
2022-03-23 | Senate | RES RPT SCS(RES) 5NR NEW TITLE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RES, FIN |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-19 | House | VERSION: CSHB 79(FIN) |
2021-05-19 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-19 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y30 N9 E1 |
2021-05-19 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y25 N14 E1 |
2021-05-19 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2021-05-18 | House | GILLHAM NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2021-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-18 | House | PASSED Y27 N12 A1 |
2021-05-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 79(FIN) |
2021-05-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/18 CALENDAR |
2021-05-17 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | FN2: (DFG) |
2021-04-26 | House | AM: RASMUSSEN |
2021-04-26 | House | NR: MERRICK, FOSTER |
2021-04-26 | House | DNP: JOHNSON |
2021-04-26 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, CARPENTER, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, THOMPSON |
2021-04-26 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 7DP 1DNP 2NR 1AM |
2021-03-03 | House | FN1: (DFG) |
2021-03-03 | House | AM: KREISS-TOMKINS, ORTIZ, STORY, STUTES |
2021-03-03 | House | NR: TARR |
2021-03-03 | House | DNP: MCCABE, VANCE |
2021-03-03 | House | FSH RPT CS(FSH) NEW TITLE 2DNP 1NR 4AM |
2021-02-18 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-02-18 | House | FN1: (DFG) |
2021-02-18 | House | FSH, FIN |
2021-02-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |