AK HB78 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to insurance; relating to an insurer's corporate governance; relating to insurance holding companies and insurance company holding systems; amending Rule 26, Alaska Rules of Civil Procedure, and Rules 402 and 501, Alaska Rules of Evidence; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Insurer & Group Insurance Disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rules Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Court Rules Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-22 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/20/19 |
2019-07-22 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/19 CHAPTER 12 SLA 19 |
2019-07-19 | House | 1:44 P.M. 7/16/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-05 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2019-05-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-13 | House | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-13 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 E1 |
2019-05-13 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 6 |
2019-05-13 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2019-05-11 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2019-05-10 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 78(RLS) AM S |
2019-05-10 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2019-05-10 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-10 | Senate | COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-10 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2019-05-10 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2019-05-10 | 1096 | |
2019-05-10 | Senate | RLS SCS ADOPTED UC |
2019-05-10 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND UC |
2019-05-10 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 78 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/10 CALENDAR |
2019-05-09 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-09 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | NR: BEGICH |
2019-05-09 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, GIESSEL, COSTELLO, VON IMHOF |
2019-05-09 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 6 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | RLS RPT SCS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE |
2019-05-06 | Senate | RLS |
2019-05-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2019-05-03 | House | VERSION: HB 78 |
2019-05-03 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2019-05-03 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2019-05-03 | House | PASSED Y38 E2 |
2019-05-03 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 78 |
2019-05-03 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2019-05-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2019-05-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2019 |
2019-04-27 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-04-27 | House | DP: HANNAN, REVAK, STUTES, TALERICO, LEDOUX |
2019-04-27 | House | L&C RPT 5DP |
2019-03-04 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2019-03-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2019-03-04 | House | L&C |
2019-03-04 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |