AK HB75 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to funding for Internet services for school districts; and relating to the Alaska higher education investment fund.
Title
Internet For Schools; Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER |
2019-05-01 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2019-05-01 | House | FN1: (EED) |
2019-05-01 | House | DP: HOPKINS, ZULKOSKY, REVAK, DRUMMOND, STORY |
2019-05-01 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) NT 5DP |
2019-03-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS |
2019-02-25 | House | EDC, FIN |
2019-02-25 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB75 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0075A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0075B.PDF |