AK HB59 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations for the operating and capital expenses of the state's integrated comprehensive mental health program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Approp: Mental Health Budget
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-06-15 - House - House: Adopt (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Conference Committee Report Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: Concur (Y: 1 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Conference Committee Report Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-12 - House - House: Concur (Y: 1 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/17 |
2017-07-01 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 1 FSSLA 17 |
2017-07-01 | House | LETTER TO AMHTA PER AS 37.14.005(C) |
2017-07-01 | House | 3:22 PM 6/28/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-06-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-06-15 | House | CC RPT ADPTD Y34 N6 CCS HB 59 |
2017-06-15 | House | POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2017-06-15 | House | WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 42(A) AND (B) UC |
2017-06-15 | House | CC REPORT TAKEN UP UC |
2017-06-13 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-06-13 | Senate | CC RPT ADPTD Y20 N- CCS HB 59 |
2017-06-13 | Senate | FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2017-06-13 | Senate | WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 42(A) AND (B) UC |
2017-06-13 | Senate | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT TAKEN UP UC |
2017-06-12 | House | CC REPORT: CCS HB 59 RECEIVED 6/10/17 3:34 P.M. |
2017-06-12 | House | CC REPORT READ AND HELD |
2017-06-12 | Senate | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT READ |
2017-06-12 | Senate | CC REPORT: CCS HB 59 RECEIVED 6/10/17 4:06 P.M. |
2017-05-18 | House | FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2017-05-18 | Senate | FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2017-05-16 | Senate | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2017-05-16 | House | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED |
2017-05-12 | Senate | HOFFMAN (CHAIR), MACKINNON, OLSON |
2017-05-12 | Senate | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2017-05-12 | Senate | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y- N19 E1 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | RECEDE MESSAGE READ |
2017-05-12 | House | SEATON (CHAIR), FOSTER, PRUITT |
2017-05-12 | House | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED |
2017-05-12 | House | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y1 N34 E4 A1 |
2017-05-12 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2017-04-07 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2017-04-06 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 59(FIN) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2017-04-06 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-06 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2017-04-05 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-05 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 59(FIN) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/5 CALENDAR |
2017-04-04 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-04 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-04 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/4/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | AM: DUNLEAVY, OLSON |
2017-04-04 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2017-04-04 | Senate | DP: MACKINNON, HOFFMAN, BISHOP, VON IMHOF |
2017-04-04 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 4DP 1NR 2AM SAME TITLE |
2017-03-22 | Senate | FIN |
2017-03-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-20 | House | VERSION: CSHB 59(FIN) |
2017-03-20 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-03-20 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-03-20 | House | PASSED Y38 N2 |
2017-03-20 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 59(FIN) |
2017-03-20 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2017-03-17 | House | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 3/20 CALENDAR |
2017-03-17 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2017-03-17 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-03-17 | House | RETURN TO SECOND UC |
2017-03-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 59 |
2017-03-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/17 CALENDAR |
2017-03-16 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/16 - ON 3/17 CALENDAR |
2017-03-15 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/16 CALENDAR |
2017-03-15 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/15 - ON 3/16 CALENDAR |
2017-03-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/15 CALENDAR |
2017-03-14 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/14 - ON 3/15 CALENDAR |
2017-03-14 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2017-03-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-13 | House | NOT TAKEN UP 3/13 - ON 3/14 CALENDAR |
2017-03-10 | House | HELD TO 3/13 CALENDAR |
2017-03-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2017 |
2017-03-10 | House | FOSTER, SEATON |
2017-03-10 | House | DP: GRENN, GUTTENBERG, THOMPSON, TILTON, KAWASAKI, PRUITT, ORTIZ, WILSON, GARA, |
2017-03-10 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 11DP |
2017-01-18 | House | OMB ATTACHMENT PER AS 37.14.003 |
2017-01-18 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2017-01-18 | House | FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget
Collective Bargaining
Corrections
Courts
Education
Health & Social Services
Housing
Labor Relations
Loans
Mental Health
Public Employees
Salaries & Allowances
Teachers
Universities
Vocational Training
Budget
Collective Bargaining
Corrections
Courts
Education
Health & Social Services
Housing
Labor Relations
Loans
Mental Health
Public Employees
Salaries & Allowances
Teachers
Universities
Vocational Training