AK HB58 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to insurance coverage for contraceptives and related services; relating to medical assistance coverage for contraceptives and related services; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contraceptives Coverage:insure;med Assist

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-06HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
2022-03-07HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2022-03-07HouseFN6: ZERO(DHS)
2022-03-07HouseFN5: ZERO(CED)
2022-03-07HouseFN4: ZERO(ADM)
2022-03-07HouseDP: SCHRAGE, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
2022-03-07HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP
2022-02-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2021-04-22HouseFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2021-04-22HouseFN2: ZERO(CED)
2021-04-22HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2021-04-22HouseDNP: PRAX, KURKA
2021-04-22HouseDP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, ZULKOSKY, SNYDER
2021-04-22HouseHSS RPT CS(HSS) 5DP 2DNP
2021-04-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SNYDER
2021-03-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE
2021-02-18HouseHSS, L&C
2021-02-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-02-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/15/21

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback