AK HB5 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-13 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-13 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the Board of Registration for Architects, Engineers, and Land Surveyors and to the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development.
Title
Bd Of Architects, Engineers, Surveyors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-13 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2013-02-13 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2013-02-13 | House | DP: HERRON, REINBOLD, SADDLER, MILLETT, JOSEPHSON, OLSON |
2013-02-13 | House | L&C RPT 6DP |
2013-01-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA |
2013-01-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON |
2013-01-16 | House | L&C, FIN |
2013-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/13 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HB5 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0005A.PDF |