AK HB47 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 25-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-18 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-18 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring a party seeking a restraining order, preliminary injunction, or order staying the operation of certain permits affecting an industrial operation to give security in the amount the court considers proper for costs incurred and damages suffered if the industrial operation is wrongfully enjoined or restrained.
Title
Injunction Security: Industrial Operation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 8 (Y: 5 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 7 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 4 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-18 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2014-04-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y33 N7 |
2014-04-18 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-04-17 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-04-17 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-17 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 26 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 47(JUD) AM S |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-16 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE |
2014-04-16 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N6 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 47(JUD) AM S |
2014-04-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-16 | Senate | AM NO 9 FAILED Y7 N13 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | AM NO 8 FAILED Y5 N14 A1 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | AM NO 7 FAILED Y4 N16 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | AM NO 6 FAILED Y4 N16 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2014-04-16 | Senate | AM NO 5 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-16 | Senate | AM NO 4 FAILED Y7 N13 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | AM NO 3 FAILED Y6 N14 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y6 N14 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N14 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | TAKEN UP IN SECOND READING |
2014-04-16 | Senate | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2014-04-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, DYSON |
2014-04-02 | Senate | FN5: ZERO(DNR) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DEC) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DEC) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CRT) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | NR: DYSON |
2014-04-02 | Senate | DNP: WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON |
2014-04-02 | Senate | DP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE |
2014-04-02 | Senate | JUD RPT 2DP 2DNP 1NR |
2014-03-14 | Senate | JUD |
2014-03-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-12 | House | VERSION: CSHB 47(JUD) |
2014-03-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, HIGGINS, NAGEAK, MUNOZ, HOLMES, NEUMAN |
2014-03-12 | House | PASSED Y26 N12 E2 |
2014-03-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 47(JUD) |
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ISAACSON |
2014-03-10 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/12 CALENDAR |
2014-03-10 | House | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-10 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, T.WILSON, GATTIS |
2014-02-21 | House | FN5: ZERO(DNR) |
2014-02-21 | House | FN4: ZERO(LAW) |
2014-02-21 | House | FN3: ZERO(DEC) |
2014-02-21 | House | FN2: ZERO(DEC) |
2014-02-21 | House | FN1: ZERO(CRT) |
2014-02-21 | House | NR: FOSTER, GRUENBERG |
2014-02-21 | House | DP: MILLETT, LEDOUX, LYNN, KELLER |
2014-02-21 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP 2NR |
2013-02-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, MILLETT |
2013-01-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PRUITT |
2013-01-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE |
2013-01-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2013-01-16 | House | JUD |
2013-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/11/13 |