AK HB42 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to seizure of property; relating to forfeiture to the state; relating to criminal law; amending Rules 3, 4, 11, 12, 16, 32, 32.2, 32.3, 39, 39.1, and 42, Alaska Rules of Criminal Procedure, Rules 501, 801, and 803, Alaska Rules of Evidence, and Rules 202, 209, and 217, Alaska Rules of Appellate Procedure; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forfeiture & Seizure: Procedure; Limits

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-31HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2017-03-31HouseFN5: (DPS)
2017-03-31HouseFN4: (LAW)
2017-03-31HouseFN3: (AJS)
2017-03-31HouseFN2: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-31HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-31HouseNR: EASTMAN, FANSLER, REINBOLD
2017-03-31HouseDP: KOPP, KREISS-TOMKINS, LEDOUX, CLAMAN
2017-03-31HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 4DP 3NR
2017-03-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
2017-02-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2017-01-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, GRENN
2017-01-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-01-18HouseJUD, FIN
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/13/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback